Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michel Abrass, B.A.

Archbishop of Tyr (Melkite Greek), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Dec 1948 Born
1967²18.0EnteredMember of Ordre Basilien Alépin (Melkite Greek)
4 Sep 196920.7Simple VowsMember of Ordre Basilien Alépin (Melkite Greek)
Feb 1980³31.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Ordre Basilien Alépin (Melkite Greek)
Feb 1980³31.1Solemn VowsMember of Ordre Basilien Alépin (Melkite Greek)
11 Apr 198031.3Ordained PriestPriest of Ordre Basilien Alépin (Melkite Greek)
13 Oct 200657.8SelectedCurial Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria
17 Oct 200657.8ConfirmedCurial Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria
17 Oct 200657.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Abydus
11 Nov 200657.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Myra dei Greco-Melkiti
10 Dec 200657.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Myra dei Greco-Melkiti
21 Jun 201465.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Tyr (Melkite Greek), Lebanon

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michel Abrass
Archbishop Michel Abrass B.A. (born ) Archbishop of Tyr

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAleppo, Syria
Ordained BishopSt. Paul, Basilica, Harissa

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Tyr (Melkite Greek).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Oct 2006
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Number 15,293
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Jun 2014
  • ente/simp/od/c1: CB, 11 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jul 2017