Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Jules Zerey

Protosyncellus of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme} (Melkite Greek)

Titular Archbishop of Damiata dei Greco-Melkiti

Auxiliary Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jun 1941 BornAlessandria d'Egitto
5 May 196725.9Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jun 200160.0AppointedProtosyncellus of Egypt and Sudan (Melkite Greek)
22 Jun 200160.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Damiata dei Greco-Melkiti
22 Jun 200160.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria
9 Nov 200160.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Damiata dei Greco-Melkiti
4 Jun 200867.0AppointedProtosyncellus of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme} (Melkite Greek), Palestine

MicroData Summary for Joseph Jules Zerey:
Archbishop Joseph Jules Zerey (born ) Protosyncellus of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

Please contact the Archbishop through the Patriarchal Dependent Territory of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme} (Melkite Greek).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Number 14,072

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013