Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Peter IV Géraigiry

Deceased

Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria

Bishop of Damas (Melkite Greek)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1841Born
21 Feb 188644.5AppointedBishop of Bāniyās (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
21 Feb 188644.5Ordained BishopBishop of Bāniyās (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
24 Feb 189856.5SelectedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria
24 Feb 189856.5SelectedBishop of Damas (Melkite Greek), Syria
24 Mar 189856.5ConfirmedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria
24 Mar 189856.5ConfirmedBishop of Damas (Melkite Greek), Syria
24 Apr 190260.6DiedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria

MicroData Summary for Peter IV Géraigiry (VIAF: 187261342)
Patriarch Peter IV Géraigiry (born , died ) Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZahlé
Ordained BishopDamas, Archdiocese of Damas (Melkite Greek)

  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 109
  • ab/b317: CB, 5 Sep 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,886, Number 7
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 249, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast