Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Cyril IX Mogabgab

Deceased

Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek)

Bishop of Damas (Melkite Greek)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1855BornAin-Zehalta
27 Mar 188327.4Ordained PriestPriest
23 Apr 189943.5SelectedBishop of Zahleh e Furzol (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
20 May 189943.6ConfirmedBishop of Zahleh e Furzol (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
28 May 189943.6Ordained BishopBishop of Zahleh e Furzol (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
8 Dec 192570.1SelectedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria
8 Dec 192570.1SelectedBishop of Damas (Melkite Greek), Syria
21 Jun 192670.6ConfirmedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria
21 Jun 192670.6ConfirmedBishop of Damas (Melkite Greek), Syria
8 Sep 194791.9DiedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria

MicroData Summary for Cyril IX Mogabgab:
Patriarch Cyril IX Mogabgab (born , died ) Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

  • a priest for 64.4 years
  • a bishop for 48.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013