Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Agapios III Matar, B.S. †

Deceased

Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek)

Bishop of Damas (Melkite Greek)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1736¹BornDamas
1782¹46.0Ordained PriestPriest of Arrouhbaniat Albassiliat Almoukhalissiat (Melkite Greek)
1795²59.0AppointedBishop of Saïda (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
10 Jul 179559.5Ordained BishopBishop of Saïda (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
31 Aug 179660.6AppointedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria
31 Aug 179660.6AppointedBishop of Damas (Melkite Greek), Syria
21 Jan 181276.0DiedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Melkite Greek), Syria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Agapios III Matar
Patriarch Agapios III Matar B.S. (born 1736, died ) Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

  • a priest for 30.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,139
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 88
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1795, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 29 Feb 2016