Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Georges Bacouni (Bakouny)

Archbishop of Beirut and Jbeil {Bairut e Gibail} (Melkite Greek), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1962 Born
30 Jul 199533.2Ordained PriestPriest of Beirut and Jbeil {Bairut e Gibail} (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
22 Jun 200543.0SelectedArchbishop of Tyr (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
20 Oct 200543.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Tyr (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
27 Nov 200543.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Tyr (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
Jun 2014³52.0SelectedArchbishop of Akka [San Giovanni d’Acri; Tolemaide] (Melkite Greek), Israel
21 Jun 201452.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Akka [San Giovanni d’Acri; Tolemaide] (Melkite Greek), Israel
5 Aug 201452.2InstalledArchbishop of Akka [San Giovanni d’Acri; Tolemaide] (Melkite Greek), Israel
9 Nov 201856.4SelectedArchbishop of Beirut and Jbeil {Bairut e Gibail} (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
24 Nov 201856.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Beirut and Jbeil {Bairut e Gibail} (Melkite Greek), Lebanon

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Georges Bacouni (Bakouny)
Archbishop Georges Bacouni (Bakouny) (born ) Archbishop of Beirut and Jbeil {Bairut e Gibail}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAin el-Roummaneh
Ordained BishopSaint-Paul, Basilica, Harissa

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Beirut and Jbeil {Bairut e Gibail} (Melkite Greek).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Oct 2005
  • c2+/ln: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Number 15,013
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Jun 2014
  • i: CB, 3 Aug 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 24 Nov 2018

Quantcast