Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pius Kerketta, S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Ranchi, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1910Born
21 Nov 194333.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
7 Mar 196150.9AppointedArchbishop of Ranchi, India
21 May 196151.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Ranchi, India
7 Aug 198575.4RetiredArchbishop of Ranchi, India
20 May 199383.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Ranchi, India

MicroData Summary for Pius Kerketta
Archbishop Pius Kerketta S.J. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Ranchi

EventPlace
Birth PlacePithra

  • a priest for 49.4 years
  • a bishop for 31.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 24 Jun 2018

Quantcast