Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Raphael Cheenath, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Cuttack-Bhubaneswar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1934BornManalur
21 Sep 196328.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
28 Feb 197439.1AppointedBishop of Sambalpur, India
18 May 197439.3Ordained BishopBishop of Sambalpur, India
1 Jul 198550.5AppointedArchbishop of Cuttack-Bhubaneswar, India
11 Feb 201176.1RetiredArchbishop of Cuttack-Bhubaneswar, India
14 Aug 201681.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Cuttack-Bhubaneswar, India

MicroData Summary for Raphael Cheenath (VIAF: 95660601)
Archbishop Raphael Cheenath S.V.D. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cuttack-Bhubaneswar

  • a priest for 52.8 years
  • a bishop for 42.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Feb 2011
  • d: CB, 15 Aug 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Aug 2016