Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George Victor Saupin, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bhagalpur, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1923Born
24 Mar 195834.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
5 Jun 197147.7AppointedBishop of Daltonganj, India
13 Oct 197148.1Ordained BishopBishop of Daltonganj, India
30 Nov 198764.2AppointedBishop of Bhagalpur, India
2 Aug 199369.9DiedBishop of Bhagalpur, India

MicroData Summary for George Victor Saupin
Bishop George Victor Saupin S.J. (born , died ) Bishop of Bhagalpur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHazaribagh

  • a priest for 35.3 years
  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast