Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philip Ekka, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Raipur, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1923Born
10 Aug 195633.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
10 Nov 197754.3AppointedBishop of Ambikapur, India
26 Feb 197854.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ambikapur, India
20 Oct 198461.2AppointedBishop of Raipur, India
15 Feb 199167.5ResignedBishop of Raipur, India
16 May 199167.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Raipur, India

MicroData Summary for Philip Ekka
Bishop Philip Ekka S.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Raipur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTalora
Ordained BishopAmbikapur, Diocese of Ambikapur

  • a priest for 34.7 years
  • a bishop for 13.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 58, Number 4,298

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast