Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Ekka

Deceased

Bishop of Raigarh, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1909Born
14 Nov 193728.4Ordained PriestPriest
29 Nov 196758.5AppointedBishop of Jalpaiguri, India
30 Mar 196858.8Ordained BishopBishop of Jalpaiguri, India
24 Apr 197161.9AppointedBishop of Raigarh-Ambikapur, India
15 Mar 198474.8DiedBishop of Raigarh, India

MicroData Summary for Francis Ekka
Bishop Francis Ekka (born , died ) Bishop of Raigarh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGinabahar

  • a priest for 46.3 years
  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast