Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Zimmermann

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Augsburg

Titular Bishop of Cerynia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1901BornLangwied
31 Oct 192625.6Ordained PriestPriest of Augsburg, Germany
28 Nov 195251.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Augsburg, Germany
28 Nov 195251.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Cerynia
25 Jan 195351.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cerynia
1 Mar 197270.9ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Augsburg, Germany
29 Dec 197675.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Augsburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Joseph Zimmermann:
Bishop Joseph Zimmermann (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Augsburg

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015