Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Lokiru Kalanda

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Fort Portal, Uganda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1927Born
21 Dec 195730.8Ordained PriestPriest
29 Nov 198053.7AppointedBishop of Moroto, Uganda
22 Mar 198154.0Ordained BishopBishop of Moroto, Uganda
17 Jun 199164.3AppointedBishop of Fort Portal, Uganda
18 Mar 200376.0RetiredBishop of Fort Portal, Uganda
19 Aug 201588.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Fort Portal, Uganda

MicroData Summary for Paul Lokiru Kalanda
Bishop Paul Lokiru Kalanda (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Fort Portal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuwunde

  • a priest for 57.6 years
  • a bishop for 34.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126
  • d: CB, 19 Aug 2015
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast