Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthias Ssekamaanya

Bishop Emeritus of Lugazi, Uganda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1936 Born
19 Dec 196529.1Ordained PriestPriest of Kampala, Uganda
9 Mar 198548.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kampala, Uganda
9 Mar 198548.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Iziriana
2 Jun 198548.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Iziriana
30 Nov 199660.1AppointedBishop of Lugazi, Uganda
4 Nov 201478.0RetiredBishop of Lugazi, Uganda

MicroData Summary for Matthias Ssekamaanya
Bishop Matthias Ssekamaanya (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Lugazi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKasolo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lugazi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Nov 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast