Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Aquirinus Kibira

Bishop of Kasese, Uganda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1958 Born
23 Sep 198426.4Ordained PriestPriest of Fort Portal, Uganda
15 Apr 201455.9AppointedBishop of Kasese, Uganda
12 Jul 201456.2Ordained BishopBishop of Kasese, Uganda

MicroData Summary for Francis Aquirinus Kibira
Bishop Francis Aquirinus Kibira (born ) Bishop of Kasese

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKigoto-Bulyansungwe
Ordained BishopOpen Air, near,, Cathedral, Kasese, Diocese of Kasese

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kasese.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Apr 2014
  • ob: CB, 29 Apr 2014
  • c2+: CB, 30 Apr 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Number 18,217
  • fn: CB, 26 May 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast