Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Franzelli, M.C.C.I.

Bishop of Lira, Uganda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1942 Born
9 Sep 196321.4ProfessedMember of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
11 Mar 196724.9Ordained PriestPriest of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
1 Apr 200562.9AppointedBishop of Lira, Uganda
9 Jul 200563.2Ordained BishopBishop of Lira, Uganda

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Franzelli
Bishop Giuseppe Franzelli M.C.C.I. (born ) Bishop of Lira

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoccafranca, Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lira.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 181, Number 14,940

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast