Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop James Francis Carney

Deceased

Archbishop of Vancouver, British Columbia, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1915Born
21 Mar 194226.7Ordained PriestPriest of Vancouver, British Columbia, Canada
7 Jan 196650.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vancouver, British Columbia, Canada
7 Jan 196650.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Obori
11 Feb 196650.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Obori
8 Jan 196953.5AppointedArchbishop of Vancouver, British Columbia, Canada
11 Feb 196953.6InstalledArchbishop of Vancouver, British Columbia, Canada
16 Sep 199075.2DiedArchbishop of Vancouver, British Columbia, Canada

MicroData Summary for James Francis Carney
Archbishop James Francis Carney (born , died ) Archbishop of Vancouver

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVancouver

  • a priest for 48.4 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast