Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Philip Mulvihill, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Whitehorse, Yukon, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1905Born
24 Jun 193731.6Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
18 Dec 196560.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Whitehorse, Yukon, Canada
18 Dec 196560.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Caput Cilla
25 Jan 196660.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caput Cilla
13 Jul 196761.7AppointedBishop of Whitehorse, Yukon, Canada
15 Oct 197166.0ResignedBishop of Whitehorse, Yukon, Canada
21 Jul 197569.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Whitehorse, Yukon, Canada

MicroData Summary for James Philip Mulvihill
Bishop James Philip Mulvihill O.M.I. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Whitehorse

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOld Chelsea

  • a priest for 38.0 years
  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 61, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast