Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martin John Amos

Bishop Emeritus of Davenport, Iowa, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1941 Born
25 May 196826.4Ordained PriestPriest of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
3 Apr 200159.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
3 Apr 200159.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Meta
7 Jun 200159.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Meta
12 Oct 200664.8AppointedBishop of Davenport, Iowa, USA
20 Nov 200664.9InstalledBishop of Davenport, Iowa, USA
19 Apr 201775.3RetiredBishop of Davenport, Iowa, USA

MicroData Summary for Martin John Amos
Bishop Martin John Amos (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Davenport

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCleveland

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Davenport.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Oct 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Number 13,989
  • i/dave: Website of the Diocese, 18 Aug 2012
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 22 Jun 2017