Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Joseph Green

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Reno, Nevada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1917BornSt. Joseph, MI
14 Jul 194628.8Ordained PriestPriest of Lansing, Michigan, USA
22 Jun 196244.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lansing, Michigan, USA
22 Jun 196244.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Trisipa
28 Aug 196244.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Trisipa
11 Mar 196749.4AppointedBishop of Reno, Nevada, USA
6 Dec 197457.1ResignedBishop of Reno, Nevada, USA
30 Aug 198264.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Reno, Nevada, USA

MicroData Summary for Michael Joseph Green:
Bishop Michael Joseph Green (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Reno

  • a priest for 36.1 years
  • a bishop for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1962, Number 129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013