Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Anthony Griffin

Bishop Emeritus of Columbus, Ohio, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1934 Born
28 May 196025.9Ordained PriestPriest of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
30 Jun 197945.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
30 Jun 197945.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Hólar
1 Aug 197945.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hólar
4 Feb 198348.6AppointedBishop of Columbus, Ohio, USA
25 Apr 198348.8InstalledBishop of Columbus, Ohio, USA
14 Oct 200470.3ResignedBishop of Columbus, Ohio, USA

MicroData Summary for James Anthony Griffin
Bishop James Anthony Griffin (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Columbus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFairview Park

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Columbus.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast