Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Franz Jung

Bishop-Elect of Würzburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1966 Born
10 Oct 199226.3Ordained PriestPriest of Speyer, Germany
16 Feb 201851.6AppointedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
10 Jun 201852.0Ordained BishopBishop of Würzburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Franz Jung (VIAF: 298169619)
Father Franz Jung (born ) Bishop-Elect of Würzburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLudwigshafen, Diocese of Speyer
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopCathedral, Würzburg, Diocese of Würzburg

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Würzburg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Feb 2018
  • ob: CB, 27 Feb 2018
  • c2+: CB, 27 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 28 Feb 2018