Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Re, I.M.C. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ampurias e Tempio, Italy

Titular Bishop of Aspona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1893Born
20 Mar 192026.4Ordained PriestPriest of Consolata Missionaries
1930²36.2AppointedPrefect of Meru, Kenya
13 Dec 193138.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Nyeri, Kenya
13 Dec 193138.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Hadrumetum
29 May 193238.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hadrumetum
1936²42.2ResignedPrefect of Meru, Kenya
Nov 1946³53.1ResignedVicar Apostolic of Nyeri, Kenya
29 Dec 195158.2AppointedBishop of Ampurias e Tempio, Italy
10 Feb 196167.3ResignedBishop of Ampurias e Tempio, Italy
10 Feb 196167.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Aspona
12 Aug 197884.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Ampurias e Tempio, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Re
Bishop Carlo Re I.M.C. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ampurias e Tempio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGiaveno

  • a priest for 58.3 years
  • a bishop for 46.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast