Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gallus (Bernhard) Steiger, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of Peramiho, Tanzania

Titular Bishop of Chalcis in Graecia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1879Born
5 Oct 190223.5ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
23 Jul 190526.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
22 Feb 192242.9AppointedPrefect of Lindi, Tanzania
15 Feb 192848.8AppointedAbbot of Lindi, Tanzania
11 Dec 193354.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Chalcis in Graecia
1 Jul 193455.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chalcis in Graecia
6 Dec 195273.6ResignedAbbot of Peramiho, Tanzania
26 Nov 196687.6DiedAbbot Emeritus of Peramiho, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Gallus (Bernhard) Steiger
Bishop Gallus (Bernhard) Steiger O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot Emeritus of Peramiho

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBüron, Switzerland

  • a priest for 61.3 years
  • a bishop for 32.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1934, Number 56
  • ab: Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 14, Page 166
  • ab: Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 20, Page 265, and Page 415
  • ab: Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 26, Page 11, and Page 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast