Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Serafín María Armora y González

Deceased

Bishop of Ciudad Victoria-Tamaulipas, Tamaulipas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1876BornOlinalá
21 Dec 189923.2Ordained PriestPriest
3 Aug 192346.8AppointedBishop of Ciudad Victoria-Tamaulipas, Tamaulipas, México
30 Nov 192347.1Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Victoria-Tamaulipas, Tamaulipas, México
6 Jan 192447.3InstalledBishop of Ciudad Victoria-Tamaulipas, Tamaulipas, México
15 Oct 195579.0DiedBishop of Ciudad Victoria-Tamaulipas, Tamaulipas, México

MicroData Summary for Serafín María Armora y González:
Bishop Serafín María Armora y González (born , died ) Bishop of Ciudad Victoria-Tamaulipas

  • a priest for 55.8 years
  • a bishop for 31.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1923, Number 69

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013