Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marciano Tinajero y Estrada

Deceased

Bishop of Querétaro, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1871Born
27 Dec 189625.1Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jun 193361.5AppointedBishop of Querétaro, México
24 Aug 193361.8Ordained BishopBishop of Querétaro, México
27 Oct 195785.9DiedBishop of Querétaro, México

MicroData Summary for Marciano Tinajero y Estrada
Bishop Marciano Tinajero y Estrada (born , died ) Bishop of Querétaro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceApaseo el Alto

  • a priest for 60.8 years
  • a bishop for 24.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1933, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast