Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerald Richard Barnes

Bishop of San Bernardino, California, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1945 Born
20 Dec 197530.4Ordained PriestPriest of San Antonio, Texas, USA
28 Jan 199246.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Bernardino, California, USA
28 Jan 199246.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Mons Faliscus
18 Mar 199246.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mons Faliscus
28 Dec 199550.5AppointedBishop of San Bernardino, California, USA

MicroData Summary for Gerald Richard Barnes
Bishop Gerald Richard Barnes (born ) Bishop of San Bernardino

EventPlace
Birth PlacePhoenix, AZ, Diocese of Tucson, Arizona
Ordained BishopSt. Christopher, Church, Moreno Valley, Diocese of San Bernardino, California

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Bernardino.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Number 11,618

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast