Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Martin David

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Ostrava-Opava, Czech Republic

Titular Bishop of Thucca in Numidia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1970 Born
24 Jun 200029.8Ordained PriestPriest of Ostrava-Opava, Czech Republic
7 Apr 201746.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ostrava-Opava, Czech Republic
7 Apr 201746.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Thucca in Numidia
28 May 201746.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thucca in Numidia

MicroData Summary for Martin David
Father Martin David (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Ostrava-Opava

EventPlace
Birth PlaceČeladná
Ordained PriestDivine Saviour, Cathedral, Ostrava, Diocese of Ostrava-Opava
Ordained BishopHoly Savior, Cathedral, Ostrava, Diocese of Ostrava-Opava

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Ostrava-Opava.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Apr 2017
  • ob: CB, 13 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Apr 2017