Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Josef Nuzik

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Olomouc, Czech Republic

Titular Bishop of Castra Galbae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1966 Born
17 Jun 199528.8Ordained PriestPriest of Olomouc, Czech Republic
5 Jul 201750.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic
5 Jul 201750.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Castra Galbae
14 Oct 201751.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castra Galbae

MicroData Summary for Josef Nuzik
Father Josef Nuzik (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Olomouc

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStráni
Ordained BishopSt. Vaclav, Cathedral, Olomouc, Archdiocese of Olomouc

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Olomouc.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Jul 2017
  • ob: CB, 11 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jul 2017