Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Antonín Basler

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Olomouc, Czech Republic

Titular Bishop of Vaga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1956 Born
30 Jun 198428.3Ordained PriestPriest of Olomouc, Czech Republic
5 Jul 201761.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic
5 Jul 201761.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Vaga
14 Oct 201761.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vaga

MicroData Summary for Antonín Basler (VIAF: 171636767)
Father Antonín Basler (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Olomouc

EventPlace
Birth PlaceŠumperk
Ordained BishopSt. Vaclav, Cathedral, Olomouc, Archdiocese of Olomouc

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Olomouc.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Jul 2017
  • ob: CB, 11 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jul 2017