Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Ángel Luis Ríos Matos

Bishop-Elect of Mayagüez, Puerto Rico


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1956 Born
11 Jan 198528.2Ordained PriestPriest of Mayagüez, Puerto Rico
9 May 202063.5AppointedBishop of Mayagüez, Puerto Rico
1 Aug 202063.8Ordained BishopBishop of Mayagüez, Puerto Rico

MicroData Summary for Ángel Luis Ríos Matos
Father Ángel Luis Ríos Matos (born ) Bishop-Elect of Mayagüez

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAguada, Diocese of Ponce
Ordained PriestAguada, Diocese of Mayagüez

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Mayagüez.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 May 2020
  • c1: CB, 9 May 2020
  • ob: CB, 16 May 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 18 May 2020

Quantcast