Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Sarsfield Glass, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Salt Lake, Utah


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1874BornBushnell, IL
15 Aug 189723.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
1 Jun 191541.2AppointedBishop of Salt Lake, Utah, USA
24 Aug 191541.4Ordained BishopBishop of Salt Lake, Utah, USA
1 Sep 191541.5InstalledBishop of Salt Lake, Utah, USA
26 Jan 192651.9DiedBishop of Salt Lake, Utah, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Sarsfield Glass:
Bishop Joseph Sarsfield Glass C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Salt Lake

  • a priest for 28.4 years
  • a bishop for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1915, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013