Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Grace

Deceased

Bishop of Sacramento, California, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1841Born
24 Jun 187634.8Ordained PriestPriest
20 Mar 189654.6AppointedBishop of Sacramento, California, USA
16 Jun 189654.8Ordained BishopBishop of Sacramento, California, USA
27 Dec 192180.4DiedBishop of Sacramento, California, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas Grace
Bishop Thomas Grace (born , died ) Bishop of Sacramento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWexford, Diocese of Ferns, Ireland
Ordained BishopHoly Sacrament, Cathedral, Sacramento, Diocese of Sacramento, California
Death PlaceSacramento, Diocese of Sacramento, California

  • a priest for 45.5 years
  • a bishop for 25.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 490
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1896, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017