Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Calixto Leiva Charry

Deceased

Bishop of Barranquilla, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1891Born
21 Nov 193342.6AppointedBishop of Barranquilla, Colombia
8 Apr 193443.0Ordained BishopBishop of Barranquilla, Colombia
12 May 193443.1InstalledBishop of Barranquilla, Colombia
16 May 193948.1DiedBishop of Barranquilla, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Luis Calixto Leiva Charry
Bishop Luis Calixto Leiva Charry (born , died ) Bishop of Barranquilla

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGarzón

  • a bishop for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast