Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Scott Cal McCaig, C.C.

Bishop of Canada, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1965 BornDuncan
Apr 1987³21.3Converted
30 Oct 199428.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Companions of the Cross
3 Jun 199529.4Ordained PriestPriest of Companions of the Cross
2006²40.0AppointedSuperior General of Companions of the Cross
8 Apr 201650.3AppointedBishop of Canada, Military
31 May 201650.4Ordained BishopBishop of Canada, Military

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Scott Cal McCaig
Bishop Scott Cal McCaig C.C. (born ) Bishop of Canada, Military

Please contact the Bishop through the Military Ordinariate of Canada, Military.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Apr 2016
  • ob: CB, 8 Apr 2016
  • c2+: CB, 19 Apr 2016
  • mn: CB, 23 Apr 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,928

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 9 Jul 2016