Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Fisette, P.M.E. †

Deceased

Bishop of Hearst, Ontario, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1943Born
8 Jun 196825.3Ordained PriestPriest of Société des Missions-Étrangères
27 Dec 199350.9AppointedBishop of Hearst, Ontario, Canada
18 Mar 199451.1Ordained BishopBishop of Hearst, Ontario, Canada
21 Dec 199552.8DiedBishop of Hearst, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Pierre Fisette
Bishop Pierre Fisette P.M.E. (born , died ) Bishop of Hearst

  • a priest for 27.5 years
  • a bishop for 1.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137, Number 12,254
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast