Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Richard William Smith

Archbishop of Edmonton, Alberta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1959 BornHalifax
23 May 198728.1Ordained PriestPriest of Halifax, Nova Scotia, Canada
27 Apr 200243.0AppointedBishop of Pembroke, Ontario, Canada
18 Jun 200243.1Ordained BishopBishop of Pembroke, Ontario, Canada
22 Mar 200747.9AppointedArchbishop of Edmonton, Alberta, Canada
1 May 200748.0InstalledArchbishop of Edmonton, Alberta, Canada

MicroData Summary for Richard William Smith:
Archbishop Richard William Smith (born ) Archbishop of Edmonton

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Edmonton.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Mar 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Number 14,199

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 8 Jan 2014