Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Francis Ryan

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Hamilton, Ontario


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1897BornDundas
21 May 192124.2Ordained PriestPriest of Hamilton, Ontario, Canada
16 Aug 193740.4AppointedBishop of Hamilton, Ontario, Canada
19 Oct 193740.6Ordained BishopBishop of Hamilton, Ontario, Canada
27 Mar 197376.0RetiredBishop of Hamilton, Ontario, Canada
23 Mar 199093.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Hamilton, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Joseph Francis Ryan:
Bishop Joseph Francis Ryan (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Hamilton

  • a priest for 68.8 years
  • a bishop for 52.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1991, Page 1,119
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1937, Number 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015