Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aldo Gerna, F.S.C.J.

Bishop Emeritus of São Mateus, Espirito Santo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 May 1931 BornArigna, Italy
22 Dec 195625.6Ordained PriestPriest of Sons of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
18 May 197140.0AppointedBishop of São Mateus, Espirito Santo, Brazil
1 Aug 197140.2Ordained BishopBishop of São Mateus, Espirito Santo, Brazil
3 Oct 200776.4RetiredBishop of São Mateus, Espirito Santo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Aldo Gerna:
Bishop Aldo Gerna F.S.C.J. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of São Mateus

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of São Mateus.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Oct 2007

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 8 Dec 2014