Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Quirino Adolfo Schmitz, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Teófilo Otoni, Minas Gerais, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1918Born
28 Nov 194325.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
22 Dec 196042.0AppointedBishop of Teófilo Otoni, Minas Gerais, Brazil
25 Apr 196142.4Ordained BishopBishop of Teófilo Otoni, Minas Gerais, Brazil
3 Aug 198566.6ResignedBishop of Teófilo Otoni, Minas Gerais, Brazil
20 Jul 200788.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Teófilo Otoni, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Quirino Adolfo Schmitz
Bishop Quirino Adolfo Schmitz O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Teófilo Otoni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGaspar

  • a priest for 63.6 years
  • a bishop for 46.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast