Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Odelir José Magri, M.C.C.I.

Bishop of Chapecó, Santa Catarina, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Apr 1963 Born
26 Jun 198825.1ProfessedMember of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
18 Oct 199229.5Ordained PriestPriest of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
11 Oct 201047.4AppointedBishop of Sobral, Ceara, Brazil
12 Dec 201047.6Ordained BishopBishop of Sobral, Ceara, Brazil
3 Dec 201451.6AppointedBishop of Chapecó, Santa Catarina, Brazil
14 Feb 201551.8InstalledBishop of Chapecó, Santa Catarina, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Odelir José Magri
Bishop Odelir José Magri M.C.C.I. (born ) Bishop of Chapecó

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCampo Erê

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Chapecó.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Oct 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,872
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Dec 2014
  • i: CB, 6 Dec 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast