Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Francis Hackett

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Hartford, Connecticut

Titular Bishop of Helenopolis in Palaestina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1911BornNew Haven
29 Jun 193624.5Ordained PriestPriest of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
10 Dec 195241.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
10 Dec 195241.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Helenopolis in Palaestina
19 Mar 195341.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Helenopolis in Palaestina
16 Dec 198675.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
30 May 199078.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Hartford, Connecticut, USA

MicroData Summary for John Francis Hackett:
Bishop John Francis Hackett (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Hartford

  • a priest for 53.9 years
  • a bishop for 37.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015