Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Charles Patrick Hanifen

Bishop Emeritus of Colorado Springs, Colorado


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1931 BornDenver
6 Jun 195928.0Ordained PriestPriest of Denver, Colorado, USA
6 Jul 197443.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Denver, Colorado, USA
6 Jul 197443.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Abercornia
20 Sep 197443.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abercornia
10 Nov 198352.4AppointedBishop of Colorado Springs, Colorado, USA
30 Jan 198452.6InstalledBishop of Colorado Springs, Colorado, USA
30 Jan 200371.6ResignedBishop of Colorado Springs, Colorado, USA

MicroData Summary for Richard Charles Patrick Hanifen:
Bishop Richard Charles Patrick Hanifen (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Colorado Springs

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Colorado Springs.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013