Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Xavier Vogt, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Yaoundé, Cameroon

Titular Bishop of Celenderis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1870Born
28 Oct 189928.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
25 Jul 190635.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Central Zanguebar {Zanguebar Centrale}, Tanzania
25 Jul 190635.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Celenderis
14 Oct 190635.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Celenderis
6 May 192251.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Cameroun
19 May 192352.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Cameroun
4 Mar 194372.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Yaoundé, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for François-Xavier Vogt
Bishop François-Xavier Vogt C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Yaoundé

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarlenheim, France

  • a priest for 43.3 years
  • a bishop for 36.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,906, Number 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast