Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josephus Hubertus Drehmanns

Deceased

Bishop of Roermond


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1843BornRoermond
17 Mar 186622.9Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jun 189956.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Roermond, Netherlands
12 Jun 189956.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Phacusa
27 Aug 189956.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Phacusa
3 Feb 190056.8SucceededBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
8 Aug 191370.3DiedBishop of Roermond, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Josephus Hubertus Drehmanns:
Bishop Josephus Hubertus Drehmanns (born , died ) Bishop of Roermond

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 13.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: JPG
  • op/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 450, and Page 488

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013