Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustin Göckel

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany

Titular Bishop of Azotus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1830Born
7 Mar 185323.0Ordained PriestPriest of Paderborn, Germany
2 May 189060.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
2 May 189060.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Azotus
22 Jun 189060.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Azotus
11 May 191282.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany

MicroData Summary for Augustin Göckel
Bishop Augustin Göckel (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Paderborn

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBürgen, Diocese of Paderborn
Ordained BishopCathedral, Köln, Archdiocese of Köln {Cologne}

  • a priest for 59.1 years
  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 136
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 26 May 2017