Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hermann Joseph Schmitz

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}

Titular Bishop of Zela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1841BornKöln
18 Apr 186523.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
7 Apr 186624.9Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
25 Aug 189352.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
25 Aug 189352.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Zela
30 Nov 189352.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zela
21 Aug 189958.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Hermann Joseph Schmitz:
Bishop Hermann Joseph Schmitz (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}

  • a priest for 33.4 years
  • a bishop for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 602

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013