Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sotěr Ferrara

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Piana degli Albanesi (Italo-Albanese), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1937Born
19 Nov 196022.9Ordained PriestPriest of Piana degli Albanesi (Italo-Albanese), Italy
15 Oct 198850.8AppointedBishop of Piana degli Albanesi (Italo-Albanese), Italy
15 Jan 198951.1Ordained BishopBishop of Piana degli Albanesi (Italo-Albanese), Italy
8 Apr 201375.3RetiredBishop of Piana degli Albanesi (Italo-Albanese), Italy
25 Nov 201779.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Piana degli Albanesi (Italo-Albanese), Italy

MicroData Summary for Sotěr Ferrara
Bishop Sotěr Ferrara (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Piana degli Albanesi

EventPlace
Birth PlacePiana degli Albanesi, Eparchy of Piana degli Albanesi (Italo-Albanese)
Ordained BishopPiana degli Albanesi, Eparchy of Piana degli Albanesi (Italo-Albanese)
Death PlacePiana degli Albanesi, Eparchy of Piana degli Albanesi (Italo-Albanese)

  • a priest for 57.0 years
  • a bishop for 28.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,451
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Apr 2013
  • d: CB, 26 Nov 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 27 Nov 2017