Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Martin Nathan

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Olomouc

Titular Bishop of Arycanda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1867BornStolzmütz
23 Jun 189123.6Ordained PriestPriest of Olomouc, Czech Republic
17 Apr 194375.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic
17 Apr 194375.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Arycanda
6 Jun 194375.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arycanda
30 Jan 194779.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Joseph Martin Nathan:
Bishop Joseph Martin Nathan (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Olomouc

  • a priest for 55.6 years
  • a bishop for 3.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1943, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013