Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cornelius Fontem Esua

Archbishop Emeritus of Bamenda, Cameroon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1943 Born
29 Dec 197128.4Ordained PriestPriest
10 Sep 198239.1AppointedBishop of Kumbo, Cameroon
8 Dec 198239.4Ordained BishopBishop of Kumbo, Cameroon
7 Dec 200461.4AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Bamenda, Cameroon
23 Jan 200662.5SucceededArchbishop of Bamenda, Cameroon
30 Dec 201976.4RetiredArchbishop of Bamenda, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Cornelius Fontem Esua
Archbishop Cornelius Fontem Esua (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bamenda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMbetta
Ordained BishopOpen Air, near S. Augustin College, Kumbo, Diocese of Kumbo

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Bamenda.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • s: Bollettino, 23 Jan 2006
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 77, Number 6,234

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast